Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2038 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-S.B. No. 2038
1+By: Rodríguez S.B. No. 2038
2+ (Fierro)
23
34
5+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
46 AN ACT
57 relating to a report by the Texas Workforce Commission regarding
68 occupational skills training for individuals with intellectual and
79 developmental disabilities.
810 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
911 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 352, Labor Code, is
1012 amended by adding Section 352.060 to read as follows:
1113 Sec. 352.060. REPORT REGARDING OCCUPATIONAL SKILLS
1214 TRAINING FOR INDIVIDUALS WITH INTELLECTUAL AND DEVELOPMENTAL
1315 DISABILITIES. (a) The commission shall prepare a report that
1416 identifies:
1517 (1) potential funding sources for occupational skills
1618 training programs for individuals with intellectual and
1719 developmental disabilities; and
1820 (2) specific occupations in high-demand industries in
1921 this state for which a postsecondary certification, occupational
2022 license, or other workforce credential is required and that may be
2123 appropriate for individuals with intellectual and developmental
2224 disabilities.
2325 (b) Not later than November 1, 2020, the commission shall:
2426 (1) publish the report in a prominent location on the
2527 commission's Internet website; and
2628 (2) submit a copy of the report to each legislative
2729 standing committee with jurisdiction over workforce development or
2830 vocational rehabilitative services.
2931 (c) This section expires September 1, 2021.
3032 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
31- ______________________________ ______________________________
32- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
33- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2038 passed the Senate on
34- April 23, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
35- ______________________________
36- Secretary of the Senate
37- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2038 passed the House on
38- May 14, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 0,
39- two present not voting.
40- ______________________________
41- Chief Clerk of the House
42- Approved:
43- ______________________________
44- Date
45- ______________________________
46- Governor