Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2038 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/15/2019

                            S.B. No. 2038


 AN ACT
 relating to a report by the Texas Workforce Commission regarding
 occupational skills training for individuals with intellectual and
 developmental disabilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 352, Labor Code, is
 amended by adding Section 352.060 to read as follows:
 Sec. 352.060.  REPORT REGARDING OCCUPATIONAL SKILLS
 TRAINING FOR INDIVIDUALS WITH INTELLECTUAL AND DEVELOPMENTAL
 DISABILITIES. (a)  The commission shall prepare a report that
 identifies:
 (1)  potential funding sources for occupational skills
 training programs for individuals with intellectual and
 developmental disabilities; and
 (2)  specific occupations in high-demand industries in
 this state for which a postsecondary certification, occupational
 license, or other workforce credential is required and that may be
 appropriate for individuals with intellectual and developmental
 disabilities.
 (b)  Not later than November 1, 2020, the commission shall:
 (1)  publish the report in a prominent location on the
 commission's Internet website; and
 (2)  submit a copy of the report to each legislative
 standing committee with jurisdiction over workforce development or
 vocational rehabilitative services.
 (c)  This section expires September 1, 2021.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2038 passed the Senate on
 April 23, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2038 passed the House on
 May 14, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 141, Nays 0,
 two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor