House
|
05/17/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2019
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Lucio
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2019
|
Referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2019
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|