Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2046 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/01/2019

                            By: Fallon S.B. No. 2046
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2019; March 21, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 May 1, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; May 1, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the photograph on certain forms of state-issued
 identification.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1702.232(c), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  The pocket card must:
 (1)  state the name of the registrant;
 (2)  contain a [color] photograph, affixed to the
 pocket card by the board at the time the card is issued, and the
 signature of the registrant;
 (3)  state the date the card was issued and the card's
 expiration date; and
 (4)  state each endorsement held by the registrant and
 the date the endorsement expires.
 SECTION 2.  Section 411.179(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  The department by rule shall adopt the form of the
 license. A license must include:
 (1)  a number assigned to the license holder by the
 department;
 (2)  a statement of the period for which the license is
 effective;
 (3)  a [color] photograph of the license holder;
 (4)  the license holder's full name, date of birth, hair
 and eye color, height, weight, and signature;
 (5)  the license holder's residence address or, as
 provided by Subsection (d), the street address of the courthouse in
 which the license holder or license holder's spouse serves as a
 federal judge or the license holder serves as a state judge;
 (6)  the number of a driver's license or an
 identification certificate issued to the license holder by the
 department; and
 (7)  the designation "VETERAN" if required under
 Subsection (e).
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a pocket card or license issued or renewed on or after the effective
 date of this Act.  A pocket card or license issued or renewed before
 the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect when
 the pocket card or license was issued, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *