Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB207 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 20, 2018

Engrossed

Bill May 10, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 16, 2019
Bill May 1, 2019