House
|
05/02/2019
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA5 Creighton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA4 Creighton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA3 Creighton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA2 Creighton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Creighton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2019
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2019
|
Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2019
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|