Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2127 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/11/2019

                    By: Creighton S.B. No. 2127
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2019; March 21, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs & Border
 Security; April 11, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 3;
 April 11, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2127 By:  Campbell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a border volunteer training program for peace officers
 employed by local law enforcement agencies.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 411, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 411.02096 to read as follows:
 Sec. 411.02096.  BORDER VOLUNTEER TRAINING PROGRAM;
 COMMISSION. (a) The department, in coordination with local law
 enforcement agencies, shall establish and administer a border
 volunteer training program for peace officers employed by local law
 enforcement agencies that will prepare the officers to:
 (1)  collaborate and cooperate with and assist any law
 enforcement agency in the interdiction, investigation, and
 prosecution of criminal activity in the Texas-Mexico border region;
 and
 (2)  collaborate and cooperate with and assist district
 attorneys, county attorneys, the border prosecution unit, and other
 prosecutors in the investigation and prosecution of allegations of
 criminal activity in the Texas-Mexico border region.
 (b)  The training program under Subsection (a) must include:
 (1)  information on criminal activity occurring along
 the Texas-Mexico border, including drug trafficking and
 trafficking of persons and other activity carried out by cartels,
 transnational gangs, and other groups engaged in organized criminal
 activity;
 (2)  best practices for investigating and prosecuting
 the criminal activity described by Subdivision (1) and securing the
 Texas-Mexico border; and
 (3)  an overview of the department's operations at the
 Texas-Mexico border, including any collaboration with the United
 States Customs and Border Protection.
 (c)  If a peace officer described by Subsection (a)
 successfully completes the training program under this section and
 volunteers to assist the department and the United States Customs
 and Border Protection with securing the Texas-Mexico border, the
 department may:
 (1)  commission the officer as an officer of the
 department; and
 (2)  deploy the officer to assist the department and,
 as applicable, the United States Customs and Border Protection, in
 securing the Texas-Mexico border.
 (d)  A commission under Subsection (c) expires as determined
 by the department. The department is not required to comply with
 Section 1701.303, Occupations Code, with respect to a peace officer
 commissioned under Subsection (c).
 (e)  A volunteer peace officer deployed by the department
 under Subsection (c) is not entitled to compensation for the
 assistance provided.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter H, Chapter 1701, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1701.359 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1701.359.  BORDER VOLUNTEER TRAINING PROGRAM. The
 commission may:
 (1)  recognize, or with the consent of the Department
 of Public Safety administer, the border volunteer training program
 established under Section 411.02096, Government Code, as a
 continuing education program for officers; and
 (2)  credit an officer who successfully completes the
 program described by Subdivision (1) with the appropriate number of
 continuing education hours.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *