Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB213 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 4, 2018

Engrossed

Bill April 11, 2019

Enrolled

Bill April 26, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 22, 2019
Bill April 2, 2019