Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2132 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/06/2019

                            S.B. No. 2132


 AN ACT
 relating to the provision of information to certain women enrolled
 in the Healthy Texas Women program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 531.0995 to read as follows:
 Sec. 531.0995.  INFORMATION FOR CERTAIN ENROLLEES IN THE
 HEALTHY TEXAS WOMEN PROGRAM. (a)  In this section, "Healthy Texas
 Women program" means a program operated by the commission that is
 substantially similar to the demonstration project operated under
 former Section 32.0248, Human Resources Code, and that is intended
 to expand access to preventive health and family planning services
 for women in this state.
 (b)  This section applies to a woman who is automatically
 enrolled in the Healthy Texas Women program following a pregnancy
 for which the woman received Medicaid, but who is no longer eligible
 to participate in Medicaid.
 (c)  After a woman described by Subsection (b) is enrolled in
 the Healthy Texas Women program, the commission shall provide to
 the woman:
 (1)  information about the Healthy Texas Women program,
 including the services provided under the program; and
 (2)  a list of health care providers who participate in
 the Healthy Texas Women program and are located in the same
 geographical area in which the woman resides.
 (d)  The commission shall consult with the Maternal
 Mortality and Morbidity Task Force established under Chapter 34,
 Health and Safety Code, to improve the process for providing the
 information required by Subsection (c), including by determining:
 (1)  the best time for providing the information; and
 (2)  the manner by which the information should be
 provided, including the information about health care providers
 described by Subsection (c)(2).
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall adopt any rules necessary to implement
 Section 531.0995, Government Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  Section 531.0995, Government Code, as added by
 this Act, applies only to a woman automatically enrolled in the
 Healthy Texas Women program on or after January 1, 2020.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2132 passed the Senate on
 April 10, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2132 passed the House on
 May 3, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 136, Nays 4, two present
 not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor