Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2137 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 7, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 10, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 22, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 28, 2019
Bill April 8, 2019