Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2137 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/22/2019

                            S.B. No. 2137


 AN ACT
 relating to the imposition and use of a hotel occupancy tax by
 certain municipalities and counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 351.1068(b) and (c), Tax Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  A municipality to which this section applies may use
 revenue derived from the municipal hotel occupancy tax to
 construct, maintain, or expand a sporting-related facility, a [or]
 sporting-related field, or related infrastructure as defined by
 Section 334.001, Local Government Code, that is located within
 2,500 feet of the facility or field and is directly related to the
 facility or field, provided that:
 (1)  the facility, field, or infrastructure is located
 on property owned by the municipality; and
 (2)  [, provided] the municipality's sports facilities
 and fields have been used in the preceding calendar year a combined
 total of more than 10 times for district, state, regional, or
 national sports tournaments, games, or events.
 (c)  A municipality to which this section applies that uses
 revenue derived from the municipal hotel occupancy tax for a
 purpose described by Subsection (b):
 (1)  shall determine the amount of municipal hotel
 occupancy tax revenue generated for the municipality by hotel
 activity attributable to the [sports tournaments, games, and events
 held on the] newly constructed, enhanced, or upgraded facilities,
 [or] fields, or related infrastructure for 10 years after the date
 the original construction, enhancements, or upgrades of the first
 of the facilities or fields are completed; and
 (2)  may not spend municipal hotel occupancy tax
 revenue for the construction, enhancement, or upgrading of the
 facilities, [or] fields, or related infrastructure in a total
 amount that exceeds the amount of area hotel revenue attributable
 to the construction, enhancements, or upgrades as determined under
 Subdivision (1).
 SECTION 2.  Section 352.002, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (s) to read as follows:
 (s)  The commissioners court of a county with a population of
 less than 17,000 that borders the Red River and in which at least
 two United States highways cross into Oklahoma may impose a tax as
 provided by Subsection (a).
 SECTION 3.  Section 352.003, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (x) to read as follows:
 (x)  The tax rate in a county authorized to impose the tax
 under Section 352.002(s) may not exceed two percent of the price
 paid for a room in a hotel.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2137 passed the Senate on
 April 10, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 1; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 21, 2019, by the
 following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2137 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 16, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 103,
 Nays 31, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor