Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2156 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/26/2019

                            S.B. No. 2156


 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of the portion of Interstate Highway 14
 in Bell County as the First Cavalry Division Veterans Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.152 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.152.  FIRST CAVALRY DIVISION VETERANS HIGHWAY.
 (a)  The portion of Interstate Highway 14 in Bell County is
 designated as the First Cavalry Division Veterans Highway.  The
 designation is in addition to any other designation.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the First Cavalry Division Veterans Highway and any
 other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2156 passed the Senate on
 April 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 25, 2019, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2156 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 144,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor