|
06/14/2019
|
Effective on 9/1/19
|
|
|
|
06/14/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/25/2019
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2019
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2019
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Record vote RV#1479
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Postponed 5/17/19 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Point of order withdrawn Rule 8, Section 1(a)(1), and Rule 8, Section 3; Article III, Section 35
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Amended 1-Perez, S. Thompson, Murphy, Morales, Swanson, Bohac, Wu, Farrar, Calanni, Rosenthal, Cain, More
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Creighton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2019
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2019
|
Referred to Texas Ports, Select
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2019
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|