Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2223 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-S.B. No. 2223
1+By: Creighton S.B. No. 2223
2+ (Canales, Cain)
23
34
5+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
46 AN ACT
57 relating to the efficient provision of pilot services by the board
68 of pilot commissioners for Harris County ports.
79 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
810 SECTION 1. Section 5007.209(b), Special District Local Laws
911 Code, is amended to read as follows:
1012 (b) The training program must provide the person with
1113 information regarding:
1214 (1) the legislation that created the authority;
1315 (2) the programs, functions, policies, rules, and
1416 budget of the authority;
1517 (3) the results of the most recent formal audit of the
1618 authority;
1719 (4) [the duties of the port commission as the board of
1820 pilot commissioners for Harris County ports under Chapter 66,
1921 Transportation Code;
2022 [(5)] the requirements of laws relating to open
2123 meetings, public information, administrative procedure, financial
2224 disclosure, and conflicts of interest; and
2325 (5) [(6)] any applicable ethics policies adopted by
2426 the port commission or the Texas Ethics Commission.
2527 SECTION 2. Section 66.016, Transportation Code, is amended
2628 by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
2729 (c) The board may adopt a rule under this chapter involving
2830 ship movement strategies, including navigation safety guidelines,
2931 for use by pilots in the navigable water in this state only on a
3032 recommendation from not less than 80 percent of the pilots
3133 authorized to operate under the board's jurisdiction.
3234 SECTION 3. Section 66.017, Transportation Code, is amended
3335 to read as follows:
3436 Sec. 66.017. DUTIES. The board shall:
3537 (1) establish the number of pilots necessary to
3638 provide adequate pilot services for each Harris County port;
3739 (2) accept applications for pilot licenses and
3840 certificates and determine whether each applicant meets the
3941 qualifications for a pilot;
4042 (3) submit to the governor lists of applicants the
4143 board finds to be qualified for appointment as pilots;
4244 (4) establish pilotage rates;
4345 (5) approve the locations for pilot stations;
4446 (6) establish times during which pilot services will
4547 be available;
4648 (7) hear and determine complaints relating to the
4749 conduct of pilots;
4850 (8) recommend to the governor each pilot whose license
4951 or certificate should not be renewed or should be revoked;
5052 (9) adopt rules and issue orders to pilots or vessels
5153 when necessary to secure efficient pilot services, including
5254 minimizing the interference of two-way routes;
5355 (10) institute investigations or hearings or both to
5456 consider casualties, accidents, or other actions that violate this
5557 chapter; and
5658 (11) provide penalties to be imposed on a person who is
5759 not a pilot for a Harris County port who pilots a vessel into or out
5860 of the port if a pilot offered those services to the vessel.
5961 SECTION 4. Subchapter B, Chapter 66, Transportation Code,
62+ is amended by adding Section 66.0171 to read as follows:
63+ Sec. 66.0171. ONE-WAY TRAFFIC. (a) In this section:
64+ (1) "One-way traffic" means a limitation on any part
65+ of the area where Galveston Bay reaches the Houston Ship Channel,
66+ including the channel immediately north of Morgan's Point, where
67+ the meeting, turnaround, and overtaking of any ships are
68+ prohibited.
69+ (2) "Port authority" means the Port of Houston
70+ Authority of Harris County, Texas.
71+ (b) Subject to Section 66.016(c), the board by rule shall
72+ adopt navigation guidelines for the transit of vessels under the
73+ board's jurisdiction.
74+ (c) Notwithstanding Section 66.016(c) and except as
75+ provided by Subsection (d), rules adopted under Subsection (b) may
76+ not authorize:
77+ (1) more than one vessel per week for which one-way
78+ traffic has been imposed to call on a port authority terminal at
79+ Bayport or Barbours Cut;
80+ (2) more than one vessel for which one-way traffic has
81+ been imposed to call on or depart from a port authority terminal at
82+ Bayport or Barbours Cut on the same day; or
83+ (3) the passage of a vessel calling on a port authority
84+ terminal at Bayport or Barbours Cut that is not capable of turning
85+ around within the turning basin that serves the port authority
86+ terminal on which the vessel calls.
87+ (d) Rules adopted under Subsection (c) do not apply to
88+ one-way traffic:
89+ (1) governed by an authorization issued by the United
90+ States Coast Guard, a dredging vessel, or a vessel operated by
91+ military forces personnel; or
92+ (2) that occurs between Morgan's Point and the Houston
93+ Turning Basin.
94+ (e) The executive director of the port authority is
95+ authorized to take any action necessary, including the execution
96+ and delivery of documents, to carry out this section.
97+ (f) This section expires August 31, 2021.
98+ SECTION 5. Subchapter B, Chapter 66, Transportation Code,
6099 is amended by adding Section 66.0172 to read as follows:
61100 Sec. 66.0172. EFFICIENT PILOT SERVICE; MAXIMUM VESSEL
62101 LENGTH. (a) In this section:
63102 (1) "Two-way route" means a directional route within
64103 defined limits inside which two-way traffic is established, and
65104 which is intended to improve safety in waters where navigation is
66105 difficult.
67106 (2) "Two-way traffic" means that traffic flow by all
68107 vessels is permitted in opposing directions.
69108 (b) Except as provided by Subsection (c), in order to ensure
70109 safe and efficient pilot services, the maximum overall length of a
71110 vessel, including the bulbous bow, that may be piloted within the
72111 board's jurisdiction is 1,100 feet.
73112 (c) Subject to Section 66.016(c), the board by rule may
74113 authorize piloting a vessel with an overall length that exceeds the
75114 maximum overall length provided by Subsection (b) if the board
76115 determines that the proposed rules would allow two-way routes to be
77116 maintained efficiently and two-way traffic to be conducted
78117 efficiently. Before adopting a rule under this subsection, the
79118 board must hold at least two public hearings. This subsection does
80119 not apply to the adoption of rules governing vessel traffic between
81120 Morgan's Point and the Houston Turning Basin.
82- SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
83- ______________________________ ______________________________
84- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
85- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2223 passed the Senate on
86- April 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2; and that
87- the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 23, 2019, by the
88- following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2.
89- ______________________________
90- Secretary of the Senate
91- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2223 passed the House, with
92- amendment, on May 17, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 139,
93- Nays 0, three present not voting.
94- ______________________________
95- Chief Clerk of the House
96- Approved:
97- ______________________________
98- Date
99- ______________________________
100- Governor
121+ SECTION 6. (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of
122+ this section, this Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
123+ (b) Sections 1, 3, and 5 of this Act take effect September 1,
124+ 2021.