Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2224 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 8, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 11, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 13, 2019
Bill March 27, 2019