Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2224 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/19/2019

                            S.B. No. 2224


 AN ACT
 relating to requiring a public retirement system to adopt a written
 funding policy.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 802, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 802.2011 to read as follows:
 Sec. 802.2011.  FUNDING POLICY. (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Funded ratio" means the ratio of a public
 retirement system's actuarial value of assets divided by the
 system's actuarial accrued liability.
 (2)  "Governmental entity" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 802.1012.
 (b)  The governing body of a public retirement system shall:
 (1)  adopt a written funding policy that details the
 governing body's plan for achieving a funded ratio of the system
 that is equal to or greater than 100 percent;
 (2)  maintain for public review at its main office a
 copy of the policy;
 (3)  file a copy of the policy and each change to the
 policy with the board not later than the 31st day after the date the
 policy or change, as applicable, is adopted; and
 (4)  submit a copy of the policy and each change to the
 policy to the system's associated governmental entity not later
 than the 31st day after the date the policy or change is adopted.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than January 1, 2020, each public
 retirement system shall adopt a funding policy as required by
 Section 802.2011, Government Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2224 passed the Senate on
 April 11, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2224 passed the House on
 May 17, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 147, Nays 0,
 two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor