House | 05/09/2019 | Referred to Public Health | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Read first time | ||
House | 05/03/2019 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/03/2019 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 05/03/2019 | Passed | ||
Senate | 05/03/2019 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 05/03/2019 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 05/03/2019 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 05/02/2019 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
Senate | 05/02/2019 | Amendment fails of adoption | ||
Senate | 05/02/2019 | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Menéndez | ||
Senate | 05/02/2019 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 05/02/2019 | Amended | ||
Senate | 05/02/2019 | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Menéndez | ||
Senate | 05/02/2019 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 05/02/2019 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/30/2019 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/21/2019 | Referred to Health & Human Services | ||
Senate | 03/08/2019 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2019 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |