Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2243 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Paxton, et al. S.B. No. 2243
2+ (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2019; March 21, 2019, read
3+ first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
4+ April 25, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
5+ Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 3; April 25, 2019,
6+ sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2243 By: Perry
29
310
411 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
512 AN ACT
613 relating to required counseling before an abortion is performed.
714 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
815 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 171, Health and Safety
916 Code, is amended by adding Section 171.01205 to read as follows:
1017 Sec. 171.01205. PRE-ABORTION COUNSELING REQUIRED. (a) In
1118 addition to the informed consent requirements under Section
1219 171.012, except during a medical emergency, and before the abortion
1320 is performed, the physician who is to perform an abortion shall
1421 certify using a unique identifying number, devoid of personally
1522 identifying information of the pregnant woman on whom the abortion
1623 is to be performed, that:
1724 (1) the pregnant woman received pre-abortion
1825 counseling at no cost to the pregnant woman from a counselor who:
1926 (A) meets the qualifications established by
2027 commission rule;
2128 (B) is not employed by, is not contracted with,
2229 and does not have a pecuniary interest in a facility licensed under
23- Chapter 245;
30+ Chapter 245; and
2431 (C) is authorized under a contract with the
2532 commission to provide counseling services in accordance with this
26- subsection; and
27- (D) provides the certification described by
28- Subdivision (3) not later than one business day or as soon as
29- practicable after the date of the woman's initial appointment with
30- the counselor;
33+ subsection;
3134 (2) the counselor provided the pregnant woman in
3235 accordance with commission rules:
3336 (A) medically accurate information using the
3437 informational materials described by Section 171.014;
3538 (B) an assessment of and offer of assistance in
3639 obtaining support services other than abortion that the pregnant
3740 woman may need or be eligible for, including housing, employment,
3841 resume development, child care, medical care, adoption services,
3942 and health benefit plan coverage;
4043 (C) education on available state and local
4144 resources to address the pregnant woman's socioeconomic needs; and
4245 (D) screening for family violence, coercion of
4346 abortion, and human trafficking; and
4447 (3) the counselor certified using a unique identifying
4548 number, devoid of personally identifying information of the
4649 pregnant woman, that the pregnant woman completed the counseling.
4750 (b) A counselor described by Subsection (a) shall report to
4851 the commission de-identified demographic information obtained
4952 through counseling provided under that subsection to assist the
5053 commission in determining the supply and demand of social services
5154 in the pregnant woman's geographic region.
5255 SECTION 2. Section 171.0121, Health and Safety Code, is
5356 amended to read as follows:
5457 Sec. 171.0121. MEDICAL RECORD. (a) Before the abortion
5558 begins, a copy of the signed, written certification received by the
5659 physician under Section 171.012(a)(6) and documentation of the
5760 completed counseling required under Section 171.01205 must be
5861 placed in the pregnant woman's medical records.
5962 (b) A copy of the signed, written certification required
6063 under Sections 171.012(a)(5) and (6) and documentation of the
6164 completed counseling required under Section 171.01205 shall be
6265 retained by the facility where the abortion is performed until:
6366 (1) the seventh anniversary of the date it is signed;
6467 or
6568 (2) if the pregnant woman is a minor, the later of:
6669 (A) the seventh anniversary of the date it is
6770 signed; or
6871 (B) the woman's 21st birthday.
6972 SECTION 3. (a) Notwithstanding Section 171.01205, Health
7073 and Safety Code, as added by this Act, and Section 171.0121, Health
7174 and Safety Code, as amended by this Act, a physician is not required
7275 to comply with the changes in law made by this Act before March 1,
7376 2021.
7477 (b) Not later than December 1, 2020, the executive
7578 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall
7679 adopt rules as necessary to implement this Act.
7780 (c) Not later than March 1, 2021, the Health and Human
7881 Services Commission shall contract with one or more counseling
7982 providers throughout the state to provide the services described by
8083 Section 171.01205, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act.
8184 SECTION 4. The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
8285 an abortion performed on or after March 1, 2021. An abortion
8386 performed before March 1, 2021, is governed by the law applicable to
8487 the abortion immediately before the effective date of this Act, and
8588 that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
8689 SECTION 5. It is the intent of the legislature that every
8790 provision, section, subsection, sentence, clause, phrase, or word
8891 in this Act, and every application of the provisions in this Act to
8992 each person or entity, are severable from each other. If any
9093 application of any provision in this Act to any person, group of
9194 persons, or circumstances is found by a court to be invalid for any
9295 reason, the remaining applications of that provision to all other
9396 persons and circumstances shall be severed and may not be affected.
9497 SECTION 6. The Health and Human Services Commission is
9598 required to implement a provision of this Act only if the
9699 legislature appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If
97100 the legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
98101 purpose, the commission may, but is not required to, implement a
99102 provision of this Act using other appropriations available for that
100103 purpose.
101104 SECTION 7. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
105+ * * * * *