Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2244 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Paxton S.B. No. 2244
2+ (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2019; March 21, 2019, read
3+ first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 11, 2019,
4+ reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0;
5+ April 11, 2019, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
49 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
510 AN ACT
611 relating to the state virtual school network and a study on digital
712 learning.
813 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
914 SECTION 1. Section 26.0031(c), Education Code, is amended
1015 to read as follows:
1116 (c) A school district or open-enrollment charter school may
1217 deny a request to enroll a student in an electronic course if:
1318 (1) a student attempts to enroll in a course load that
1419 is inconsistent with the student's high school graduation plan or
1520 requirements for college admission or earning an industry
1621 certification; or
1722 (2) the student requests permission to enroll in an
1823 electronic course at a time that is not consistent with the
1924 enrollment period established by the school district or
2025 open-enrollment charter school providing the course[; or
2126 [(3) the district or school offers a substantially
2227 similar course].
2328 SECTION 2. Section 30A.153(a), Education Code, is amended
2429 to read as follows:
2530 (a) A [Subject to the limitation imposed under Subsection
2631 (a-1), a] school district or open-enrollment charter school in
2732 which a student is enrolled is entitled to funding under Chapter 42
2833 or in accordance with the terms of a charter granted under Section
2934 12.101 for the student's enrollment in an electronic course offered
3035 through the state virtual school network in the same manner that the
3136 district or school is entitled to funding for the student's
3237 enrollment in courses provided in a traditional classroom setting,
3338 provided that the student successfully completes the electronic
3439 course.
3540 SECTION 3. Section 30A.155(a), Education Code, is amended
3641 to read as follows:
3742 (a) A school district or open-enrollment charter school may
3843 charge a fee for enrollment in an electronic course provided
3944 through the state virtual school network to a student who resides in
4045 this state and[:
4146 [(1)] is enrolled in a school district or
4247 open-enrollment charter school as a full-time student with a course
4348 load greater than that normally taken by students in the equivalent
4449 grade level in other school districts or open-enrollment charter
4550 schools[; or
4651 [(2) elects to enroll in an electronic course provided
4752 through the network for which the school district or
4853 open-enrollment charter school in which the student is enrolled as
4954 a full-time student declines to pay the cost, as authorized by
5055 Section 26.0031(c-1)].
5156 SECTION 4. Sections 26.0031(c-1) and 30A.153(a-1),
5257 Education Code, are repealed.
5358 SECTION 5. (a) The Texas Education Agency shall conduct a
5459 study regarding the effectiveness of digital learning in public
5560 schools. The study must include:
5661 (1) methods of providing digital learning to students
5762 in kindergarten through 12th grade; and
5863 (2) recommendations regarding the establishment of
5964 partnerships between school districts or open-enrollment charter
6065 schools and institutions of higher education and other public and
6166 private entities to provide digital learning options.
6267 (b) Not later than September 1, 2020, the Texas Education
6368 Agency shall submit to the commissioner of education and each
6469 legislative standing committee with primary jurisdiction over
6570 public education a report that includes:
6671 (1) the results of the study conducted under this
6772 section; and
6873 (2) recommendations to improve digital learning,
6974 including virtual learning under Chapter 30A, Education Code.
7075 (c) Based on the results of the study and the report
7176 prepared under this section, the commissioner of education shall
7277 establish procedures to increase:
7378 (1) digital learning by students and participation in
7479 the virtual school network; and
7580 (2) participation by school districts and
7681 open-enrollment charter schools in establishing partnerships with
7782 institutions of higher education and other public and private
7883 entities.
7984 (d) This section expires January 1, 2021.
80- SECTION 6. The Texas Education Agency is required to
81- implement a provision of this Act only if the legislature
82- appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If the
83- legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
84- purpose, the agency may, but is not required to, implement a
85- provision of this Act using other appropriations available for that
86- purpose.
87- SECTION 7. This Act applies beginning with the 2019-2020
85+ SECTION 6. This Act applies beginning with the 2019-2020
8886 school year.
89- SECTION 8. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
87+ SECTION 7. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
9088 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
9189 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
9290 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
9391 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
92+ * * * * *