Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2248 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 8, 2019

Engrossed

Bill May 15, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2019
Bill May 2, 2019