Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2271 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/23/2019

                            By: Miles S.B. No. 2271
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2019; March 21, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 23, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 0; April 23, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to compensation under the Crime Victims' Compensation Act
 for certain expenses.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 56.42(d), Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (d)  A [victim who is a] victim of stalking, family violence,
 or trafficking of persons, [or] a victim of sexual assault who is
 assaulted in the victim's place of residence, or a child who is a
 victim of a murder attempt in the child's place of residence may
 receive a onetime-only assistance payment in an amount not to
 exceed:
 (1)  $2,000 to be used for relocation expenses,
 including expenses for rental deposit, utility connections,
 expenses relating to the moving of belongings, motor vehicle
 mileage expenses, and for out-of-state moves, transportation,
 lodging, and meals; and
 (2)  $1,800 to be used for housing rental expenses.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a victim of a criminal offense committed on or after the
 effective date of this Act. A criminal offense committed before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date the offense was committed, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose. For purposes of this section, a criminal
 offense was committed before the effective date of this Act if any
 element of the offense occurred before that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *