Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2272 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 8, 2019

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 16, 2019
Bill April 17, 2019