Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2283 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/30/2019

                    By: Campbell S.B. No. 2283
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2019; March 21, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 30, 2019,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 0; April 30, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2283 By:  Campbell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the eligibility of persons convicted of certain
 offenses to serve as a member of a board of trustees of a school
 district.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.066, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 11.066.  ELIGIBILITY FOR SERVICE BY TRUSTEE WHO IS
 CONVICTED OF CERTAIN OFFENSES OR WHO PLEADS GUILTY OR NOLO
 CONTENDERE TO THOSE OFFENSES [OFFENSE].  A person is ineligible to
 serve as a member of the board of trustees of a school district if
 the person has been convicted of or pleaded guilty or nolo
 contendere to a felony or an offense under Section 43.02(b), Penal
 Code.
 SECTION 2.  Section 11.066, Education Code, as amended by
 this Act, applies only to a member of a board of trustees of a school
 district who is elected or appointed on or after the effective date
 of this Act. A member of a board of trustees of a school district
 elected or appointed before the effective date of this Act
 continues to serve for the term to which the member was elected or
 appointed unless otherwise removed as provided by law.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *