Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2283 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/26/2019

                            S.B. No. 2283


 AN ACT
 relating to the eligibility of persons convicted of certain
 offenses to serve as a member of a board of trustees of a school
 district.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.066, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 11.066.  ELIGIBILITY FOR SERVICE BY TRUSTEE CONVICTED
 OF CERTAIN OFFENSES [OFFENSE].  A person is ineligible to serve as a
 member of the board of trustees of a school district if the person
 has been convicted of a felony or an offense under Section 43.02(b),
 Penal Code.
 SECTION 2.  Section 11.066, Education Code, as amended by
 this Act, applies only to a member of a board of trustees of a school
 district who is elected or appointed on or after the effective date
 of this Act. A member of a board of trustees of a school district
 elected or appointed before the effective date of this Act
 continues to serve for the term to which the member was elected or
 appointed unless otherwise removed as provided by law.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2283 passed the Senate on
 May 7, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 25, 2019, by the
 following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2283 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 140,
 Nays 3, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor