Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB232 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 13, 2018

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2019
Bill April 30, 2019