|
06/10/2019
|
Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . September 1, 2020
|
|
|
|
06/10/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/28/2019
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2019
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2019
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2019
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2019
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2019
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2019
|
Record vote RV#2012
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2019
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2019
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds HR 2187
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2019
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2019
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2019
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds SR 845
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2019
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2019
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2019
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Record vote RV#1508
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Record vote RV#1507
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Amended 5-Gutierrez
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Amended 4-Geren
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Amended 3-Neave
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Amended 2-Canales
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Amended 1-Leach
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2019
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2019
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2019
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|