Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2342 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 8, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 17, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 27, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 8, 2019
Bill April 8, 2019