Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2357 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Lucio S.B. No. 2357
2- (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2019; March 21, 2019, read
3- first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
4- Relations; April 25, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
5- Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 1;
6- April 25, 2019, sent to printer.)
7-Click here to see the committee vote
8- COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2357 By: Lucio
92
103
114 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
125 AN ACT
136 relating to issues affecting counties and other political
147 subdivisions of the state.
158 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
169 SECTION 1. Sections 418.005(a), (b), (c), and (e),
1710 Government Code, are amended to read as follows:
1811 (a) This section applies only to:
1912 (1) an elected law enforcement officer or county
2013 judge, or an appointed public officer of the state or of a political
2114 subdivision, who has management or supervisory responsibilities
2215 and:
2316 (A) [(1)] whose position description, job
2417 duties, or assignment includes emergency management
2518 responsibilities; or
2619 (B) [(2)] who plays a role in emergency
2720 preparedness, response, or recovery; and
2821 (2) an emergency management coordinator designated
2922 under Section 418.1015(c) by the emergency management director of a
3023 county with a population of 500,000 or more.
3124 (b) Each person described by Subsection (a) shall complete a
3225 course of training provided or approved by the division of not less
3326 than three hours regarding the responsibilities of state and local
3427 governments under this chapter not later than the 180th day after
3528 the date the person:
3629 (1) takes the oath of office, if the person is required
3730 to take an oath of office to assume the person's duties as a public
3831 officer; [or]
3932 (2) otherwise assumes responsibilities as a public
4033 officer, if the person is not required to take an oath of office to
4134 assume the person's duties; or
4235 (3) is designated as an emergency management
4336 coordinator under Section 418.1015(c).
4437 (c) The division shall develop and provide a training course
4538 related to the emergency management responsibilities of
4639 state-level officers and a training course related to the emergency
4740 management responsibilities of officers and emergency management
4841 coordinators of political subdivisions. The division shall ensure
4942 that the training courses satisfy the requirements of Subsection
5043 (b).
5144 (e) The division or other entity providing the training
5245 shall provide a certificate of course completion to a person
5346 [public officers] who completes [complete] the training required by
5447 this section. A person [public officer] who completes the training
5548 required by this section shall maintain and make available for
5649 public inspection the record of the person's [public officer's]
5750 completion of the training.
58- SECTION 2. Section 245.007(a), Local Government Code, is
51+ SECTION 2. Section 418.102, Government Code, is amended by
52+ adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
53+ (a-1) An emergency management program required by
54+ Subsection (a) and maintained by a county, or in which a county
55+ participates, must provide for catastrophic debris management.
56+ SECTION 3. Section 245.007(a), Local Government Code, is
5957 amended to read as follows:
6058 (a) This section applies only to a building or facility that
6159 is owned by a county with a population of 2.3 [3.3] million or more
6260 and is located within the boundaries of another political
6361 subdivision.
64- SECTION 3. Section 262.0225, Local Government Code, is
62+ SECTION 4. Section 262.0225, Local Government Code, is
6563 amended by amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsection (c-1) to
6664 read as follows:
6765 (c) A county may receive bids or proposals under this
6866 subchapter in hard-copy format or through electronic transmission.
6967 Except as provided by Subsection (c-1), a [A] county shall accept
7068 any bids or proposals submitted in hard-copy format.
7169 (c-1) A commissioners court of a county may by order require
7270 submission of bids or proposals under this subchapter through
7371 electronic transmission.
74- SECTION 4. Section 391.0095(e), Local Government Code, is
72+ SECTION 5. Section 387.003(a-1), Local Government Code, is
73+ amended to read as follows:
74+ (a-1) A district may perform inside or outside [the
75+ following functions in] the district a function that benefits the
76+ district and that the county is authorized to perform, including:
77+ (1) the construction, maintenance, or improvement of
78+ roads or highways;
79+ (2) the provision of law enforcement and detention
80+ services;
81+ (3) the maintenance or improvement of libraries,
82+ museums, parks, or other recreational facilities;
83+ (4) the provision of services that benefit the public
84+ health or welfare, including the provision of firefighting and fire
85+ prevention services; or
86+ (5) the promotion of economic development and tourism.
87+ SECTION 6. Section 391.0095(e), Local Government Code, is
7588 amended to read as follows:
7689 (e) A commission shall send to the governor, the state
7790 auditor, [the comptroller,] and the Legislative Budget Board a copy
7891 of each report and audit required under this section or under
7992 Section 391.009. The state auditor may review each audit and
8093 report, subject to a risk assessment performed by the state auditor
8194 and to the legislative audit committee's approval of including the
8295 review in the audit plan under Section 321.013, Government Code. If
8396 the state auditor reviews the audit or report, the state auditor
8497 must be given access to working papers and other supporting
8598 documentation that the state auditor determines is necessary to
8699 perform the review. If the state auditor finds significant issues
87100 involving the administration or operation of a commission or its
88101 programs, the state auditor shall report its findings and related
89102 recommendations to the legislative audit committee, the governor,
90103 and the commission. The governor and the legislative audit
91104 committee may direct the commission to prepare a corrective action
92105 plan or other response to the state auditor's findings or
93106 recommendations. The legislative audit committee may direct the
94107 state auditor to perform any additional audit or investigative work
95108 that the committee determines is necessary.
96- SECTION 5. Not later than March 1, 2020, each person who is
109+ SECTION 7. Not later than March 1, 2020, each person who is
97110 required to complete a course of training under Section 418.005,
98111 Government Code, as amended by this Act, must complete the
99112 training.
100- SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
101- * * * * *
113+ SECTION 8. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.