Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2357 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/25/2019

                            By: Lucio S.B. No. 2357
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2019; March 21, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 25, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 1;
 April 25, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2357 By:  Lucio


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to issues affecting counties and other political
 subdivisions of the state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 418.005(a), (b), (c), and (e),
 Government Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  This section applies only to:
 (1)  an elected law enforcement officer or county
 judge, or an appointed public officer of the state or of a political
 subdivision, who has management or supervisory responsibilities
 and:
 (A) [(1)]  whose position description, job
 duties, or assignment includes emergency management
 responsibilities; or
 (B) [(2)]  who plays a role in emergency
 preparedness, response, or recovery; and
 (2)  an emergency management coordinator designated
 under Section 418.1015(c) by the emergency management director of a
 county with a population of 500,000 or more.
 (b)  Each person described by Subsection (a) shall complete a
 course of training provided or approved by the division of not less
 than three hours regarding the responsibilities of state and local
 governments under this chapter not later than the 180th day after
 the date the person:
 (1)  takes the oath of office, if the person is required
 to take an oath of office to assume the person's duties as a public
 officer; [or]
 (2)  otherwise assumes responsibilities as a public
 officer, if the person is not required to take an oath of office to
 assume the person's duties; or
 (3)  is designated as an emergency management
 coordinator under Section 418.1015(c).
 (c)  The division shall develop and provide a training course
 related to the emergency management responsibilities of
 state-level officers and a training course related to the emergency
 management responsibilities of officers and emergency management
 coordinators of political subdivisions. The division shall ensure
 that the training courses satisfy the requirements of Subsection
 (b).
 (e)  The division or other entity providing the training
 shall provide a certificate of course completion to a person
 [public officers] who completes [complete] the training required by
 this section. A person [public officer] who completes the training
 required by this section shall maintain and make available for
 public inspection the record of the person's [public officer's]
 completion of the training.
 SECTION 2.  Section 245.007(a), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  This section applies only to a building or facility that
 is owned by a county with a population of 2.3 [3.3] million or more
 and is located within the boundaries of another political
 subdivision.
 SECTION 3.  Section 262.0225, Local Government Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsection (c-1) to
 read as follows:
 (c)  A county may receive bids or proposals under this
 subchapter in hard-copy format or through electronic transmission.
 Except as provided by Subsection (c-1), a [A] county shall accept
 any bids or proposals submitted in hard-copy format.
 (c-1)  A commissioners court of a county may by order require
 submission of bids or proposals under this subchapter through
 electronic transmission.
 SECTION 4.  Section 391.0095(e), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (e)  A commission shall send to the governor, the state
 auditor, [the comptroller,] and the Legislative Budget Board a copy
 of each report and audit required under this section or under
 Section 391.009. The state auditor may review each audit and
 report, subject to a risk assessment performed by the state auditor
 and to the legislative audit committee's approval of including the
 review in the audit plan under Section 321.013, Government Code. If
 the state auditor reviews the audit or report, the state auditor
 must be given access to working papers and other supporting
 documentation that the state auditor determines is necessary to
 perform the review. If the state auditor finds significant issues
 involving the administration or operation of a commission or its
 programs, the state auditor shall report its findings and related
 recommendations to the legislative audit committee, the governor,
 and the commission. The governor and the legislative audit
 committee may direct the commission to prepare a corrective action
 plan or other response to the state auditor's findings or
 recommendations. The legislative audit committee may direct the
 state auditor to perform any additional audit or investigative work
 that the committee determines is necessary.
 SECTION 5.  Not later than March 1, 2020, each person who is
 required to complete a course of training under Section 418.005,
 Government Code, as amended by this Act, must complete the
 training.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *