Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB240 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 13, 2018

Engrossed

Bill April 11, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 6, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 30, 2019
Bill March 6, 2019