House
|
05/17/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2019
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2019
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 RodrÃguez
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2019
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
Permission to introduce
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|