Senate | 04/16/2019 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2019 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2019 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/07/2019 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | ||
Senate | 02/07/2019 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 12/19/2018 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/19/2018 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |