Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB253 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/11/2019

                            By: Rodríguez S.B. No. 253
 (In the Senate - Filed December 19, 2018; February 7, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 11, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 3; April 11, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to expedited proceedings in cases involving dangerously
 damaged or deteriorated or substandard buildings or improvements in
 a municipality.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 51.014(a), Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A person may appeal from an interlocutory order of a
 district court, county court at law, statutory probate court, or
 county court that:
 (1)  appoints a receiver or trustee;
 (2)  overrules a motion to vacate an order that
 appoints a receiver or trustee;
 (3)  certifies or refuses to certify a class in a suit
 brought under Rule 42 of the Texas Rules of Civil Procedure;
 (4)  grants or refuses a temporary injunction or grants
 or overrules a motion to dissolve a temporary injunction as
 provided by Chapter 65;
 (5)  denies a motion for summary judgment that is based
 on an assertion of immunity by an individual who is an officer or
 employee of the state or a political subdivision of the state;
 (6)  denies a motion for summary judgment that is based
 in whole or in part upon a claim against or defense by a member of
 the electronic or print media, acting in such capacity, or a person
 whose communication appears in or is published by the electronic or
 print media, arising under the free speech or free press clause of
 the First Amendment to the United States Constitution, or Article
 I, Section 8, of the Texas Constitution, or Chapter 73;
 (7)  grants or denies the special appearance of a
 defendant under Rule 120a, Texas Rules of Civil Procedure, except
 in a suit brought under the Family Code;
 (8)  grants or denies a plea to the jurisdiction by a
 governmental unit as that term is defined in Section 101.001;
 (9)  denies all or part of the relief sought by a motion
 under Section 74.351(b), except that an appeal may not be taken from
 an order granting an extension under Section 74.351;
 (10)  grants relief sought by a motion under Section
 74.351(l);
 (11)  denies a motion to dismiss filed under Section
 90.007;
 (12)  denies a motion to dismiss filed under Section
 27.003; [or]
 (13)  denies a motion for summary judgment filed by an
 electric utility regarding liability in a suit subject to Section
 75.0022; or
 (14)  denies a motion filed by a governmental unit as
 defined by Section 101.001 of this code in an action filed under
 Section 54.012(6) or 214.0012, Local Government Code.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter B, Chapter 54, Local Government Code,
 is amended by adding Section 54.0155 to read as follows:
 Sec. 54.0155.  EXPEDITED PROCEEDINGS FOR CERTAIN CIVIL
 ACTIONS.  (a)  A court shall expedite any proceeding, including an
 appeal in accordance with Subsection (b), related to a suit brought
 under this subchapter for the enforcement of an ordinance relating
 to dangerously damaged or deteriorated structures or improvements
 as described by Section 54.012(6).
 (b)  An appeal of a suit described by Subsection (a) is
 governed by the procedures for accelerated appeals in civil cases
 under the Texas Rules of Appellate Procedure.  The appellate court
 shall render its final order or judgment with the least possible
 delay.
 SECTION 3.  Section 214.001, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (s) to read as follows:
 (s)  A court shall expedite any proceeding, including an
 appeal in accordance with Section 214.0012, related to a
 substandard building determination under this section.
 SECTION 4.  Section 214.0012, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (i) to read as follows:
 (i)  An appeal under this section is governed by the
 procedures for accelerated appeals in civil cases under the Texas
 Rules of Appellate Procedure. The district court shall render its
 final order or judgment with the least possible delay.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *