Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB27 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/21/2019

                            S.B. No. 27


 AN ACT
 relating to recovery of damages, attorney's fees, and costs related
 to frivolous claims and regulatory actions by state agencies.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Chapter 105, Civil Practice and
 Remedies Code, is amended to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 105. FRIVOLOUS CLAIM OR REGULATORY ACTION BY STATE AGENCY
 SECTION 2.  Section 105.002, Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 105.002.  RECOVERY OF FEES, EXPENSES, AND ATTORNEY'S
 FEES FOR FRIVOLOUS CLAIM. A party to a civil suit in a court of this
 state brought by or against a state agency in which the agency
 asserts a cause of action against the party, either originally or as
 a counterclaim or cross claim, is entitled to recover, in addition
 to all other costs allowed by law or rule, a total amount not to
 exceed $1 million for fees, expenses, and reasonable attorney's
 fees incurred by the party in defending the agency's action if:
 (1)  the court finds that the action is frivolous[,
 unreasonable, or without foundation]; and
 (2)  the action is dismissed or judgment is awarded to
 the party.
 SECTION 3.  Section 105.003(a), Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  To recover under Section 105.002 [this chapter], the
 party must file a written motion alleging that the agency's claim is
 frivolous[, unreasonable, or without foundation]. The motion may
 be filed at any time after the filing of the pleadings in which the
 agency's cause of action is alleged.
 SECTION 4.  Chapter 105, Civil Practice and Remedies Code,
 is amended by adding Section 105.005 to read as follows:
 Sec. 105.005.  RECOVERY OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS IN
 FRIVOLOUS REGULATORY ACTION. The court reviewing a decision in a
 contested case under Chapter 2001, Government Code, may award a
 person, in addition to all other costs allowed by law or rule, an
 amount not to exceed $1 million for reasonable attorney's fees and
 costs incurred in defending against a frivolous regulatory action
 during the contested case and judicial review of the decision in the
 contested case if:
 (1)  the person prevails on review; and
 (2)  there is a final determination that the regulatory
 action is frivolous.
 SECTION 5.  Section 2001.058, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (e-1) to read as follows:
 (e-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (e), a state agency may
 not vacate or modify an order of an administrative law judge that
 awards attorney's fees and costs under Section 2001.903.
 SECTION 6.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 2001, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2001.903 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2001.903.  RECOVERY OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS IN
 CONTESTED CASES INVOLVING FRIVOLOUS REGULATORY ACTION. The
 administrative law judge in a contested case may award a person, in
 addition to all other costs allowed by law or rule, an amount not to
 exceed $1 million for reasonable attorney's fees and costs incurred
 in defending against a frivolous regulatory action during the case
 if there is no judicial review of the decision in the case and:
 (1)  the person prevails in the case; and
 (2)  there is a final determination that the regulatory
 action is frivolous.
 SECTION 7.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a claim filed or regulatory action taken on or after the
 effective date of this Act. A claim filed or regulatory action
 taken before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law
 applicable to the claim or regulatory action immediately before the
 effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 8.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 27 passed the Senate on
 April 8, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 1; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 21, 2019, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 27 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 14, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 136,
 Nays 3, three present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor