Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB300 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/01/2019

                    By: Miles S.B. No. 300
 (In the Senate - Filed January 4, 2019; February 7, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 1, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0;
 April 1, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 300 By:  Menéndez


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to indefinite quantity contracts for the provision of
 certain services to declared disaster areas following a natural
 disaster.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2254.004(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  In procuring architectural, engineering, or land
 surveying services, including procuring those services under an
 indefinite quantity contract under Section 31.069, Natural
 Resources Code, a governmental entity shall:
 (1)  first select the most highly qualified provider of
 those services on the basis of demonstrated competence and
 qualifications; and
 (2)  then attempt to negotiate with that provider a
 contract at a fair and reasonable price.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter C, Chapter 31, Natural Resources
 Code, is amended by adding Section 31.069 to read as follows:
 Sec. 31.069.  INDEFINITE QUANTITY CONTRACTS FOR SERVICES
 AFTER DECLARED NATURAL DISASTER. (a)  The land office shall enter
 into indefinite quantity contracts with vendors to provide
 information management services, construction services, including
 engineering construction services, and other services the land
 office determines may be necessary to construct, repair, or rebuild
 property or infrastructure in the event of a natural disaster.
 (b)  A contract entered into under Subsection (a) may not
 expire after May 1 of a calendar year.  The terms of a contract under
 Subsection (a) must:
 (1)  provide that the contract is contingent on:
 (A)  the availability of funds;
 (B)  the occurrence of a natural disaster not
 later than 48 months after the effective date of the contract; and
 (C)  delivery of the services to an area of this
 state declared by the governor or president of the United States
 under law to be a disaster area as a result of the natural disaster;
 and
 (2)  have a term of four years.
 (c)  The land office shall ensure that it has contracts in
 place under this section with vendors to provide the services
 described by Subsection (a) that take effect immediately on the
 expiration of a contract under this section.
 (d)  A contract under this section may be funded by multiple
 sources including local, state, and federal agencies and the
 disaster contingency fund established under Section 418.073,
 Government Code.
 (e)  If the land office determines that federal funds may be
 used for a contract under Subsection (a), the land office shall
 ensure that the contract complies with the requirements of the
 Federal Acquisition Regulation (48 C.F.R. Chapter 1), or a
 successor regulation.
 (f)  In awarding a contract under this section, the land
 office shall consider and apply any applicable state law and rules
 of the land office relating to contracting with historically
 underutilized businesses.
 (g)  If on September 1, 2019, the land office has indefinite
 quantity contracts with vendors for the provision of the types of
 services specified by Subsection (a), the land office is not
 required to enter into new indefinite quantity contracts that meet
 the requirements of this section until those existing contracts
 expire. This subsection expires September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 3.  Except as provided by Section 31.069(g), Natural
 Resources Code, as added by this Act, the General Land Office shall
 enter into indefinite quantity contracts required by Section
 31.069, Natural Resources Code, as added by this Act, not later than
 May 1, 2020.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *