4 | 8 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 9 | | relating to indefinite quantity contracts for the provision of |
---|
6 | 10 | | certain services to declared disaster areas following a natural |
---|
7 | 11 | | disaster. |
---|
8 | 12 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 13 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 31, Natural Resources |
---|
10 | 14 | | Code, is amended by adding Section 31.069 to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 15 | | Sec. 31.069. INDEFINITE QUANTITY CONTRACTS FOR SERVICES |
---|
12 | 16 | | AFTER DECLARED NATURAL DISASTER. (a) The land office shall enter |
---|
13 | 17 | | into indefinite quantity contracts with vendors to provide |
---|
14 | 18 | | information management services, construction services, including |
---|
15 | 19 | | engineering services, and other services the land office determines |
---|
16 | 20 | | may be necessary to construct, repair, or rebuild property or |
---|
17 | 21 | | infrastructure in the event of a natural disaster. |
---|
18 | 22 | | (b) A contract entered into under Subsection (a) may not |
---|
19 | 23 | | expire after May 1 of a calendar year. The terms of a contract under |
---|
20 | 24 | | Subsection (a) must: |
---|
21 | 25 | | (1) provide that the contract is contingent on: |
---|
22 | 26 | | (A) the availability of funds; |
---|
23 | 27 | | (B) the occurrence of a natural disaster not |
---|
24 | 28 | | later than 48 months after the effective date of the contract; and |
---|
25 | 29 | | (C) delivery of the services to an area of this |
---|
26 | 30 | | state declared by the governor or president of the United States |
---|
27 | 31 | | under law to be a disaster area as a result of the natural disaster; |
---|
28 | 32 | | and |
---|
29 | 33 | | (2) have a term of four years. |
---|
30 | 34 | | (c) The land office shall ensure that it has contracts in |
---|
31 | 35 | | place under this section with vendors to provide the services |
---|
32 | 36 | | described by Subsection (a) that take effect immediately on the |
---|
33 | 37 | | expiration of a contract under this section. |
---|
34 | 38 | | (d) A contract under this section may be funded by multiple |
---|
35 | 39 | | sources including local, state, and federal agencies and the |
---|
36 | 40 | | disaster contingency fund established under Section 418.073, |
---|
37 | 41 | | Government Code. |
---|
38 | 42 | | (e) If the land office determines that federal funds may be |
---|
39 | 43 | | used for a contract under Subsection (a), the land office shall |
---|
40 | 44 | | ensure that the contract complies with the requirements of the |
---|
41 | 45 | | Federal Acquisition Regulation (48 C.F.R. Chapter 1), or a |
---|
42 | 46 | | successor regulation. |
---|
43 | 47 | | (f) In awarding a contract under this section, the land |
---|
44 | 48 | | office shall consider and apply any applicable state law and rules |
---|
45 | 49 | | of the land office relating to contracting with historically |
---|
46 | 50 | | underutilized businesses. |
---|
47 | 51 | | (g) If on September 1, 2019, the land office has indefinite |
---|
48 | 52 | | quantity contracts with vendors for the provision of the types of |
---|
49 | 53 | | services specified by Subsection (a), the land office is not |
---|
50 | 54 | | required to enter into new indefinite quantity contracts that meet |
---|
51 | 55 | | the requirements of this section until those existing contracts |
---|
52 | 56 | | expire. This subsection expires September 1, 2023. |
---|
53 | 57 | | (h) The land office shall follow the procedures provided by |
---|
54 | 58 | | Section 2254.004, Government Code, in contracting for engineering |
---|
55 | 59 | | services under this section. |
---|
56 | 60 | | SECTION 2. Except as provided by Section 31.069(g), Natural |
---|
57 | 61 | | Resources Code, as added by this Act, the General Land Office shall |
---|
58 | 62 | | enter into indefinite quantity contracts required by Section |
---|
59 | 63 | | 31.069, Natural Resources Code, as added by this Act, not later than |
---|
60 | 64 | | May 1, 2020. |
---|
61 | 65 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
62 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
63 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
64 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 300 passed the Senate on |
---|
65 | | - | April 4, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that |
---|
66 | | - | the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 21, 2019, by the |
---|
67 | | - | following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
68 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
69 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
70 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 300 passed the House, with |
---|
71 | | - | amendment, on May 15, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 139, |
---|
72 | | - | Nays 4, two present not voting. |
---|
73 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
74 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
75 | | - | Approved: |
---|
76 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
77 | | - | Date |
---|
78 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
79 | | - | Governor |
---|