Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB300 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/21/2019

                            S.B. No. 300


 AN ACT
 relating to indefinite quantity contracts for the provision of
 certain services to declared disaster areas following a natural
 disaster.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 31, Natural Resources
 Code, is amended by adding Section 31.069 to read as follows:
 Sec. 31.069.  INDEFINITE QUANTITY CONTRACTS FOR SERVICES
 AFTER DECLARED NATURAL DISASTER. (a)  The land office shall enter
 into indefinite quantity contracts with vendors to provide
 information management services, construction services, including
 engineering services, and other services the land office determines
 may be necessary to construct, repair, or rebuild property or
 infrastructure in the event of a natural disaster.
 (b)  A contract entered into under Subsection (a) may not
 expire after May 1 of a calendar year.  The terms of a contract under
 Subsection (a) must:
 (1)  provide that the contract is contingent on:
 (A)  the availability of funds;
 (B)  the occurrence of a natural disaster not
 later than 48 months after the effective date of the contract; and
 (C)  delivery of the services to an area of this
 state declared by the governor or president of the United States
 under law to be a disaster area as a result of the natural disaster;
 and
 (2)  have a term of four years.
 (c)  The land office shall ensure that it has contracts in
 place under this section with vendors to provide the services
 described by Subsection (a) that take effect immediately on the
 expiration of a contract under this section.
 (d)  A contract under this section may be funded by multiple
 sources including local, state, and federal agencies and the
 disaster contingency fund established under Section 418.073,
 Government Code.
 (e)  If the land office determines that federal funds may be
 used for a contract under Subsection (a), the land office shall
 ensure that the contract complies with the requirements of the
 Federal Acquisition Regulation (48 C.F.R. Chapter 1), or a
 successor regulation.
 (f)  In awarding a contract under this section, the land
 office shall consider and apply any applicable state law and rules
 of the land office relating to contracting with historically
 underutilized businesses.
 (g)  If on September 1, 2019, the land office has indefinite
 quantity contracts with vendors for the provision of the types of
 services specified by Subsection (a), the land office is not
 required to enter into new indefinite quantity contracts that meet
 the requirements of this section until those existing contracts
 expire. This subsection expires September 1, 2023.
 (h)  The land office shall follow the procedures provided by
 Section 2254.004, Government Code, in contracting for engineering
 services under this section.
 SECTION 2.  Except as provided by Section 31.069(g), Natural
 Resources Code, as added by this Act, the General Land Office shall
 enter into indefinite quantity contracts required by Section
 31.069, Natural Resources Code, as added by this Act, not later than
 May 1, 2020.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 300 passed the Senate on
 April 4, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 21, 2019, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 300 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 15, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 139,
 Nays 4, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor