Senate | 04/17/2019 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2019 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 03/20/2019 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/20/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/20/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/01/2019 | Referred to Higher Education | ||
Senate | 02/01/2019 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 11/12/2018 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/12/2018 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |