Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB355 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/14/2019

                    By: West, Kolkhorst S.B. No. 355
 (In the Senate - Filed January 15, 2019; February 7, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human
 Services; March 14, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 March 14, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 355 By:  Perry


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to developing a strategic plan to ensure that the
 provision of prevention and early intervention services complies
 with federal law.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 40, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 40.079 to read as follows:
 Sec. 40.079.  STRATEGIC PLAN TO IMPLEMENT FEDERAL LAW
 REGARDING FOSTER CARE PREVENTION SERVICES. (a)  The department
 shall develop a strategic plan for the implementation of foster
 care prevention services that meet the requirements of Title VII,
 Div. E, Pub. L. No. 115-123.
 (b)  The strategic plan required under this section must:
 (1)  identify a network of services providers to
 provide mental health, substance use, and in-home parenting support
 services for:
 (A)  children at risk of entering foster care;
 (B)  the parents and caregivers of children
 identified under Paragraph (A); and
 (C)  pregnant or parenting youth in foster care;
 (2)  identify methods to:
 (A)  maximize resources from the federal
 government under Title VII, Div. E, Pub. L. No. 115-123;
 (B)  apply for other available federal and private
 funds;
 (C)  streamline and reduce duplication of effort
 by each state agency involved in providing services described by
 Subdivision (1); and
 (D)  streamline the procedures for determining
 eligibility for services described by Subdivision (1);
 (3)  include a method to:
 (A)  notify the Senate Health and Human Services
 Committee, the Senate Finance Committee, the House Committee on
 Human Services, the House Committee on Public Health, and the House
 Appropriations Committee of federal and private funding
 opportunities; and
 (B)  respond to the opportunities described by
 Paragraph (A); and
 (4)  identify opportunities to coordinate with
 independent researchers to assist community programs in evaluating
 and developing trauma-informed services and promising, supported,
 or well-supported services and strategies under Title VII, Div. E,
 Pub. L. No. 115-123.
 (c)  In identifying the network of providers described by
 Subsection (b)(1), the department shall consult with the Health and
 Human Services Commission, the Department of State Health Services,
 and community stakeholders.
 (d)  In developing the procedure described by Subsection
 (b)(2), the department shall consult with the Health and Human
 Services Commission and the Department of State Health Services.
 (e)  This section expires March 1, 2021.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than September 1, 2020, the Department
 of Family and Protective Services shall make the plan required by
 Section 40.079, Human Resources Code, as added by this Act,
 available to the Senate Health and Human Services Committee, the
 Senate Finance Committee, the House Committee on Human Services,
 the House Committee on Public Health, and the House Appropriations
 Committee.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *