Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB355 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/26/2019

                            S.B. No. 355


 AN ACT
 relating to developing a strategic plan regarding implementation of
 prevention and early intervention services and community-based
 care and conducting a study regarding the resources provided to
 foster parents.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 40, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 40.079 to read as follows:
 Sec. 40.079.  STRATEGIC STATE PLAN TO IMPLEMENT
 COMMUNITY-BASED CARE AND FOSTER CARE PREVENTION SERVICES. (a)  The
 department shall develop a strategic plan for the coordinated
 implementation of:
 (1)  community-based care as defined by Section
 264.152, Family Code; and
 (2)  foster care prevention services that meet the
 requirements of Title VII, Div. E, Pub. L. No. 115-123.
 (b)  The strategic plan required under this section must:
 (1)  identify a network of services providers to
 provide mental health, substance use, and in-home parenting support
 services for:
 (A)  children at risk of entering foster care;
 (B)  the parents and caregivers of children
 identified under Paragraph (A); and
 (C)  pregnant or parenting youth in foster care;
 (2)  identify methods for the statewide implementation
 of foster care prevention services, including implementation in
 department regions that are transitioning to community-based care;
 (3)  identify resources necessary for the department to
 implement community-based care and to coordinate that
 implementation with the implementation of foster care prevention
 services, including:
 (A)  enhanced training related to procurement,
 contract monitoring and enforcement services, information
 technology services, and financial and legal services;
 (B)  a financial methodology for funding the
 implementation of community-based care and foster care prevention
 services; and
 (C)  resources to address the placement of
 children in settings eligible for federal financial participation
 under the requirements of Title VII, Div. E, Pub. L. No. 115-123;
 (4)  identify methods to:
 (A)  maximize resources from the federal
 government under Title VII, Div. E, Pub. L. No. 115-123;
 (B)  apply for other available federal and private
 funds;
 (C)  streamline and reduce duplication of effort
 by each state agency involved in providing services described by
 Subdivision (1);
 (D)  streamline the procedures for determining
 eligibility for services described by Subdivision (1);
 (E)  prescribe and terminate services described
 by Subdivision (1); and
 (F)  reduce recidivism in foster care prevention
 services;
 (5)  include a method to:
 (A)  notify the Senate Health and Human Services
 Committee, the Senate Finance Committee, the House Committee on
 Human Services, the House Committee on Public Health, and the House
 Appropriations Committee of federal and private funding
 opportunities; and
 (B)  respond to the opportunities described by
 Paragraph (A); and
 (6)  identify opportunities to coordinate with
 independent researchers to assist community programs in evaluating
 and developing trauma-informed services and promising, supported,
 or well-supported services and strategies under Title VII, Div. E,
 Pub. L. No. 115-123.
 (c)  In identifying the network of providers described by
 Subsection (b)(1), the department shall consult with the Health and
 Human Services Commission, the Department of State Health Services,
 and community stakeholders.
 (d)  This section does not supersede or limit the
 department's duty to develop and maintain the plan under Section
 264.153, Family Code.
 (e)  The department shall submit the plan developed under
 this section to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker
 of the house of representatives, and each member of the standing
 committees of the senate and house of representatives having
 primary jurisdiction over child welfare issues not later than
 September 1, 2020.
 (f)  This section expires September 1, 2021.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  The Department of Family and Protective
 Services shall conduct a study to evaluate whether the department
 provides foster parents with adequate resources to ensure that
 foster parents are able to comply with all of the regulations
 relating to providing care for a child in the conservatorship of the
 department.
 (b)  Not later than September 1, 2020, the department shall
 prepare and submit to the legislature a written report containing
 the results of the study and any recommendations for legislative or
 other action.
 (c)  This section expires September 1, 2021.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 355 passed the Senate on
 March 20, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0;
 May 23, 2019, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 23, 2019, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 25, 2019, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 30,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 355 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 142,
 Nays 2, two present not voting; May 23, 2019, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 25, 2019, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 139, Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor