9 | 12 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 13 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 40, Human Resources Code, |
---|
11 | 14 | | is amended by adding Section 40.079 to read as follows: |
---|
12 | 15 | | Sec. 40.079. STRATEGIC STATE PLAN TO IMPLEMENT |
---|
13 | 16 | | COMMUNITY-BASED CARE AND FOSTER CARE PREVENTION SERVICES. (a) The |
---|
14 | 17 | | department shall develop a strategic plan for the coordinated |
---|
15 | 18 | | implementation of: |
---|
16 | 19 | | (1) community-based care as defined by Section |
---|
17 | 20 | | 264.152, Family Code; and |
---|
18 | 21 | | (2) foster care prevention services that meet the |
---|
19 | 22 | | requirements of Title VII, Div. E, Pub. L. No. 115-123. |
---|
20 | 23 | | (b) The strategic plan required under this section must: |
---|
21 | 24 | | (1) identify a network of services providers to |
---|
22 | 25 | | provide mental health, substance use, and in-home parenting support |
---|
23 | 26 | | services for: |
---|
24 | 27 | | (A) children at risk of entering foster care; |
---|
25 | 28 | | (B) the parents and caregivers of children |
---|
26 | 29 | | identified under Paragraph (A); and |
---|
27 | 30 | | (C) pregnant or parenting youth in foster care; |
---|
28 | 31 | | (2) identify methods for the statewide implementation |
---|
29 | 32 | | of foster care prevention services, including implementation in |
---|
30 | 33 | | department regions that are transitioning to community-based care; |
---|
31 | 34 | | (3) identify resources necessary for the department to |
---|
32 | 35 | | implement community-based care and to coordinate that |
---|
33 | 36 | | implementation with the implementation of foster care prevention |
---|
34 | 37 | | services, including: |
---|
35 | 38 | | (A) enhanced training related to procurement, |
---|
36 | 39 | | contract monitoring and enforcement services, information |
---|
37 | 40 | | technology services, and financial and legal services; |
---|
38 | 41 | | (B) a financial methodology for funding the |
---|
39 | 42 | | implementation of community-based care and foster care prevention |
---|
40 | 43 | | services; and |
---|
41 | 44 | | (C) resources to address the placement of |
---|
42 | 45 | | children in settings eligible for federal financial participation |
---|
43 | 46 | | under the requirements of Title VII, Div. E, Pub. L. No. 115-123; |
---|
44 | 47 | | (4) identify methods to: |
---|
45 | 48 | | (A) maximize resources from the federal |
---|
46 | 49 | | government under Title VII, Div. E, Pub. L. No. 115-123; |
---|
47 | 50 | | (B) apply for other available federal and private |
---|
48 | 51 | | funds; |
---|
49 | 52 | | (C) streamline and reduce duplication of effort |
---|
50 | 53 | | by each state agency involved in providing services described by |
---|
51 | 54 | | Subdivision (1); |
---|
52 | 55 | | (D) streamline the procedures for determining |
---|
53 | 56 | | eligibility for services described by Subdivision (1); |
---|
54 | 57 | | (E) prescribe and terminate services described |
---|
55 | 58 | | by Subdivision (1); and |
---|
56 | 59 | | (F) reduce recidivism in foster care prevention |
---|
57 | 60 | | services; |
---|
58 | 61 | | (5) include a method to: |
---|
59 | 62 | | (A) notify the Senate Health and Human Services |
---|
60 | 63 | | Committee, the Senate Finance Committee, the House Committee on |
---|
61 | 64 | | Human Services, the House Committee on Public Health, and the House |
---|
62 | 65 | | Appropriations Committee of federal and private funding |
---|
63 | 66 | | opportunities; and |
---|
64 | 67 | | (B) respond to the opportunities described by |
---|
65 | 68 | | Paragraph (A); and |
---|
66 | 69 | | (6) identify opportunities to coordinate with |
---|
67 | 70 | | independent researchers to assist community programs in evaluating |
---|
68 | 71 | | and developing trauma-informed services and promising, supported, |
---|
69 | 72 | | or well-supported services and strategies under Title VII, Div. E, |
---|
70 | 73 | | Pub. L. No. 115-123. |
---|
71 | 74 | | (c) In identifying the network of providers described by |
---|
72 | 75 | | Subsection (b)(1), the department shall consult with the Health and |
---|
73 | 76 | | Human Services Commission, the Department of State Health Services, |
---|
74 | 77 | | and community stakeholders. |
---|
75 | 78 | | (d) This section does not supersede or limit the |
---|
76 | 79 | | department's duty to develop and maintain the plan under Section |
---|
77 | 80 | | 264.153, Family Code. |
---|
78 | 81 | | (e) The department shall submit the plan developed under |
---|
79 | 82 | | this section to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker |
---|
80 | 83 | | of the house of representatives, and each member of the standing |
---|
81 | 84 | | committees of the senate and house of representatives having |
---|
82 | 85 | | primary jurisdiction over child welfare issues not later than |
---|
83 | | - | September 1, 2020. |
---|
84 | | - | (f) This section expires September 1, 2021. |
---|
85 | | - | SECTION 2. (a) The Department of Family and Protective |
---|
86 | | - | Services shall conduct a study to evaluate whether the department |
---|
87 | | - | provides foster parents with adequate resources to ensure that |
---|
88 | | - | foster parents are able to comply with all of the regulations |
---|
89 | | - | relating to providing care for a child in the conservatorship of the |
---|
90 | | - | department. |
---|
91 | | - | (b) Not later than September 1, 2020, the department shall |
---|
92 | | - | prepare and submit to the legislature a written report containing |
---|
93 | | - | the results of the study and any recommendations for legislative or |
---|
94 | | - | other action. |
---|
95 | | - | (c) This section expires September 1, 2021. |
---|
96 | | - | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
| 86 | + | December 30, 2019. |
---|
| 87 | + | (f) This section expires March 1, 2020. |
---|
| 88 | + | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
101 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
102 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
103 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 355 passed the Senate on |
---|
104 | | - | March 20, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; |
---|
105 | | - | May 23, 2019, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and |
---|
106 | | - | requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 23, 2019, House |
---|
107 | | - | granted request of the Senate; May 25, 2019, Senate adopted |
---|
108 | | - | Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 30, |
---|
109 | | - | Nays 0. |
---|
110 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
111 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
112 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 355 passed the House, with |
---|
113 | | - | amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 142, |
---|
114 | | - | Nays 2, two present not voting; May 23, 2019, House granted request |
---|
115 | | - | of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; |
---|
116 | | - | May 25, 2019, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the |
---|
117 | | - | following vote: Yeas 139, Nays 0, one present not voting. |
---|
118 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
119 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
120 | | - | Approved: |
---|
121 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
122 | | - | Date |
---|
123 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
124 | | - | Governor |
---|