Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB442 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/15/2019

                            S.B. No. 442


 AN ACT
 relating to a disclosure regarding flood coverage under a
 commercial or residential property insurance policy.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 2002, Insurance Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2002.103 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2002.103.  DISCLOSURE REGARDING FLOOD COVERAGE
 REQUIRED. (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Commercial property insurance" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 2301.002, except that the term includes a
 commercial multiperil insurance policy that provides commercial
 property insurance coverage.
 (2)  "Residential property insurance" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 2301.002, except that the term includes a farm
 and ranch insurance policy and a farm and ranch owners insurance
 policy.
 (b)  This section applies to each insurer authorized to
 engage in the business of commercial or residential property
 insurance in this state, including a county mutual insurance
 company, farm mutual insurance company, Lloyd's plan, and
 reciprocal or interinsurance exchange.
 (c)  An insurer that issues or renews a commercial or
 residential property insurance policy that does not provide
 coverage against loss caused by flooding shall include with the
 policy documents provided to the policyholder at the time the
 policy is issued or renewed the following statement:
 "Flood Insurance:  You may also need to consider the purchase
 of flood insurance.  Your insurance policy does not include
 coverage for damage resulting from a flood even if hurricane winds
 and rain caused the flood to occur.  Without separate flood
 insurance coverage, you may have uncovered losses caused by a
 flood.  Please discuss the need to purchase separate flood
 insurance coverage with your insurance agent or insurance company,
 or visit www.floodsmart.gov."
 (d)  The statement described by Subsection (c) must be
 conspicuous, as defined by Section 1.201, Business & Commerce Code.
 (e)  An insurer's failure to comply with this section does
 not invalidate any exclusion, including a flood exclusion, in an
 insurance policy subject to this section.
 SECTION 2.  Section 2002.103, Insurance Code, as added by
 this Act, applies only to an insurance policy delivered, issued for
 delivery, or renewed on or after January 1, 2020. A policy
 delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed before January 1, 2020,
 is governed by the law as it existed immediately before the
 effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 442 passed the Senate on
 April 17, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 442 passed the House on
 May 15, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 140, Nays 7,
 two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor