House | 04/04/2019 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Read first time | ||
House | 04/03/2019 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/02/2019 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/01/2019 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 03/21/2019 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/21/2019 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/21/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 03/19/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/05/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/05/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/04/2019 | Posting rule suspended | ||
Senate | 02/14/2019 | Referred to Education | ||
Senate | 01/28/2019 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/28/2019 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |