Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB489 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 28, 2019

Engrossed

Bill March 18, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 1, 2019
Bill March 11, 2019