|
06/06/2019
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
|
06/06/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/05/2019
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/28/2019
|
Sent to the Comptroller
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2019
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2019
|
Signed in Senate-Art III Sec 49a Tx. Const.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2019
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2019
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2019
|
House adopts resolution for tech. correction SCR 67
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2019
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2019
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2019
|
Record vote RV#1950
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2019
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2019
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds HR 2179
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2019
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2019
|
Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction SCR 67
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2019
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2019
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds SR 842
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2019
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2019
|
Subject to Art.III Sec.49a Tx. Constitution
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2019
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2019
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2019
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2019
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2019
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2019
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2019
|
Record vote RV#113
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2019
|
Record vote RV#112
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2019
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2019
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2019
|
Amended 3-Huberty
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2019
|
Amended 2-Morrison
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2019
|
Amendment withdrawn 1-Kacal
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2019
|
Placed on Emergency Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2019
|
Record vote RV#55
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2019
|
Calendars Committee rule adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2019
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2019
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2019
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2019
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2019
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2019
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2019
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2019
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Taylor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2019
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2019
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2019
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2019
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2019
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|