Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB533 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2019

Engrossed

Bill March 27, 2019

Enrolled

Bill April 24, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 15, 2019
Bill March 14, 2019