Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB533 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-S.B. No. 533
1+By: Birdwell, et al. S.B. No. 533
2+ (Paddie, Springer)
23
34
5+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
46 AN ACT
57 relating to the severance tax exemption for oil and gas produced
68 from certain inactive wells.
79 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
810 SECTION 1. Section 202.056(a)(4), Tax Code, is amended to
911 read as follows:
1012 (4) "Two-year inactive well" means a well that has not
1113 produced oil or gas in more than one month in the two years
1214 preceding the date of application for severance tax exemption under
1315 this section. The term does not include a well that is:
1416 (A) part of an enhanced oil recovery project, as
1517 defined by Section 89.002, Natural Resources Code; or
1618 (B) drilled but not completed and that does not
1719 have a record of hydrocarbon production reported to the commission.
1820 SECTION 2. Section 202.056, Tax Code, is amended by
1921 amending Subsections (b), (c), (d), (e), (h), and (i) and adding
2022 Subsections (j) and (k) to read as follows:
2123 (b) Hydrocarbons produced from a well qualify for a
2224 five-year [10-year] severance tax exemption if the commission
2325 designates the well as a [three-year inactive well or a] two-year
2426 inactive well. The commission may require an applicant to provide
2527 the commission with any relevant information required to administer
2628 this section. The commission may require additional well tests to
2729 determine well capability as the commission [it] deems necessary.
2830 The commission shall notify the comptroller in writing immediately
2931 if the commission [it] determines that the operation of the
3032 [three-year inactive well or] two-year inactive well has been
3133 terminated or if the commission [it] discovers any information that
3234 affects the taxation of the production from the designated well.
3335 (c) [If the commission designates a three-year inactive
3436 well under this section, it shall issue a certificate designating
3537 the well as a three-year inactive well as defined by Subsection
3638 (a)(3) of this section. The commission may not designate a
3739 three-year inactive well under this section after February 29,
3840 1996.] If the commission designates a two-year inactive well under
3941 this section, the commission [it] shall issue a certificate
4042 designating the well as a two-year inactive well [as defined by
4143 Subsection (a)(4) of this section. The commission may not
4244 designate a two-year inactive well under this section after
4345 February 28, 2010].
4446 (d) [An application for three-year inactive well
4547 certification shall be made during the period of September 1, 1993,
4648 through August 31, 1995, to qualify for the tax exemption under this
4749 section.] An application for two-year inactive well certification
4850 must be made to the commission [shall be made during the period
4951 September 1, 1997, through August 31, 2009,] to qualify for the tax
5052 exemption under this section. Hydrocarbons sold after the date of
5153 certification are eligible for the tax exemption.
5254 (e) The commission may revoke a certificate if information
5355 indicates that a certified well was not a [three-year inactive well
5456 or a] two-year inactive well[, as appropriate,] or if other lease
5557 production is credited to the certified well. Upon notice to the
5658 operator from the commission that the certificate for tax exemption
5759 under this section has been revoked, the tax exemption may not be
5860 applied to hydrocarbons sold from that well from the date of
5961 revocation.
6062 (h) If the tax is paid at the full rate provided by Section
6163 201.052(a) or[, 201.052(b),] 202.052(a)[, or 202.052(b)] before
6264 the comptroller approves an application for an exemption provided
6365 for in this chapter, the operator is entitled to a credit against
6466 taxes imposed by this chapter in an amount equal to the tax paid. To
6567 receive a credit, the operator must apply to the comptroller for the
6668 credit before the expiration of the applicable period for filing a
6769 tax refund claim under Section 111.104.
6870 (i) A [Penalties
6971 [(1) Any] person who makes or subscribes any
7072 application, report, or other document and submits the application,
7173 report, or other document [it] to the commission to form the basis
7274 for an application for a tax exemption under this section, knowing
7375 that the application, report, or other document is false or untrue
7476 in a material fact, may be subject to the penalties imposed by
7577 Chapters 85 and 91, Natural Resources Code.
7678 (j) On [(2) Upon] notice from the commission that the
7779 certification for a [three-year inactive well or a] two-year
7880 inactive well has been revoked, the tax exemption shall not apply to
7981 oil or gas production sold after the date of notification. A [Any]
8082 person who violates this subsection is liable to the state for a
8183 civil penalty if the person applies or attempts to apply the tax
8284 exemption allowed by this chapter after the certification for a
8385 [three-year inactive well or a] two-year inactive well is revoked.
8486 The amount of the penalty may not exceed the sum of:
8587 (1) [(A)] $10,000; and
8688 (2) [(B)] the difference between the amount of taxes
8789 paid or attempted to be paid and the amount of taxes due.
8890 (k) [(3)] The attorney general may recover a penalty under
8991 Subsection (j) [Subdivision (2) of this subsection] in a suit
9092 brought on behalf of the state. Venue for the suit is in Travis
9193 County.
9294 SECTION 3. Section 202.056(a)(3), Tax Code, is repealed.
9395 SECTION 4. The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
9496 an oil or gas well designated by the Railroad Commission of Texas as
9597 a two-year inactive well on or after the effective date of this Act.
9698 An oil or gas well designated by the Railroad Commission of Texas as
9799 a two-year inactive well, or as a three-year inactive well, before
98100 the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect
99101 immediately before that date, and the former law is continued in
100102 effect for that purpose.
101103 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
102- ______________________________ ______________________________
103- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
104- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 533 passed the Senate on
105- March 27, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
106- ______________________________
107- Secretary of the Senate
108- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 533 passed the House on
109- April 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 134, Nays 0, two
110- present not voting.
111- ______________________________
112- Chief Clerk of the House
113- Approved:
114- ______________________________
115- Date
116- ______________________________
117- Governor