Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB557 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 11, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 4, 2019
Bill March 13, 2019