Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB560 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 30, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 14, 2019
Bill April 24, 2019