4 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 7 | | relating to a plan and report on court-ordered representation for |
---|
6 | 8 | | certain suits affecting the parent-child relationship. |
---|
7 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 71, Government Code, is |
---|
9 | 11 | | amended by adding Section 71.0355 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 12 | | Sec. 71.0355. PLAN AND REPORT ON COURT-ORDERED |
---|
11 | 13 | | REPRESENTATION. (a) The council shall develop a statewide plan |
---|
12 | 14 | | requiring counties and courts in this state to report information |
---|
13 | 15 | | on court-ordered representation for appointments made in suits |
---|
14 | 16 | | affecting the parent-child relationship under Part 1, Subchapter B, |
---|
15 | 17 | | Chapter 107, Family Code. In developing the plan, the council must |
---|
16 | 18 | | consider the costs to counties of implementing the plan and design |
---|
17 | 19 | | the plan to reduce redundant reporting. |
---|
18 | 20 | | (b) Not later than November 1 of each odd-numbered year and |
---|
19 | 21 | | in the form and manner prescribed in the plan, each local |
---|
20 | 22 | | administrative district judge for a court subject to the plan, or |
---|
21 | 23 | | the person designated by the judge, shall prepare and provide to the |
---|
22 | 24 | | council: |
---|
23 | 25 | | (1) a copy of all formal and informal rules and forms |
---|
24 | 26 | | the court uses to appoint representation in suits affecting the |
---|
25 | 27 | | parent-child relationship under Part 1, Subchapter B, Chapter 107, |
---|
32 | 31 | | (c) Each county auditor, or other individual designated by |
---|
33 | 32 | | the commissioners court of a county, shall prepare and send to the |
---|
34 | 33 | | council, in the form and manner prescribed in the plan, information |
---|
35 | 34 | | on the money spent by the county during the preceding state fiscal |
---|
36 | 35 | | year to provide court-ordered representation in suits affecting the |
---|
37 | 36 | | parent-child relationship under Part 1, Subchapter B, Chapter 107, |
---|
38 | 37 | | Family Code. The information must include: |
---|
39 | 38 | | (1) the total amount of money spent by the county to |
---|
40 | 39 | | provide court-ordered representation services; and |
---|
41 | 40 | | (2) of the money spent under Subdivision (1), the |
---|
42 | 41 | | amount of money spent: |
---|
43 | 42 | | (A) for appointments in each district court, |
---|
44 | 43 | | county court, statutory county court, and appellate court in the |
---|
45 | 44 | | county; |
---|
46 | 45 | | (B) for appointments of private attorneys for |
---|
47 | 46 | | respondents, including parents, children, and alleged fathers, who |
---|
48 | 47 | | are indigent; |
---|
49 | 48 | | (C) for appointments of public counsel for |
---|
50 | 49 | | respondents, including parents, children, and alleged fathers, who |
---|
51 | 50 | | are indigent; and |
---|
52 | 51 | | (D) for investigation, expert witness, or other |
---|
53 | 52 | | litigation expenses. |
---|
54 | 53 | | (d) Each local administrative district judge for a court |
---|
55 | 54 | | subject to the plan, or the person designated by the judge, and each |
---|
56 | 55 | | county auditor, or other individual designated by the commissioners |
---|
57 | 56 | | court of a county, shall provide to the council the information |
---|
58 | 57 | | required under the plan and this section. |
---|
59 | 58 | | (e) The council annually shall: |
---|
60 | 59 | | (1) compile in a report the information submitted to |
---|
61 | 60 | | the council under the plan and this section; |
---|
62 | 61 | | (2) submit the report compiled under Subdivision (1) |
---|
63 | 62 | | to the governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the house of |
---|
64 | 63 | | representatives; and |
---|
65 | 64 | | (3) electronically publish the report compiled under |
---|
66 | 65 | | Subdivision (1). |
---|
67 | 66 | | SECTION 2. (a) As soon as practicable after the effective |
---|
68 | 67 | | date of this Act, the Texas Judicial Council shall develop the plan |
---|
69 | 68 | | required by Section 71.0355, Government Code, as added by this Act. |
---|
70 | 69 | | (b) Notwithstanding Section 71.0355, Government Code, as |
---|
71 | 70 | | added by this Act, a county or court in this state is not required to |
---|
72 | 71 | | comply with that section until September 1, 2020, or a later date |
---|
73 | 72 | | provided in the plan developed under that section. |
---|
74 | 73 | | SECTION 3. The Texas Judicial Council is required to |
---|
75 | 74 | | implement a provision of this Act only if the legislature |
---|
76 | 75 | | appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If the |
---|
77 | 76 | | legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that |
---|
78 | 77 | | purpose, the council may, but is not required to, implement a |
---|
79 | 78 | | provision of this Act using other appropriations available for that |
---|
80 | 79 | | purpose. |
---|
81 | 80 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
82 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
83 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
84 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 560 passed the Senate on |
---|
85 | | - | April 30, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1; and that |
---|
86 | | - | the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 24, 2019, by the |
---|
87 | | - | following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
88 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
89 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
90 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 560 passed the House, with |
---|
91 | | - | amendment, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 142, |
---|
92 | | - | Nays 0, two present not voting. |
---|
93 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
94 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
95 | | - | Approved: |
---|
96 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
97 | | - | Date |
---|
98 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
99 | | - | Governor |
---|